EP3689975 - COATED COLOR-CONVERTING PARTICLES AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 S. Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATKINS, Charles, M. 1313 W. Meander Drive Eagle, ID Idaho 83616 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 20150579.9 | 26.11.2012 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | US201113308199 | 30.11.2011 Original published format: US201113308199 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689975 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/08, C09K11/02, H05B33/02, H01L33/50, C09K11/08 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H01L33/502 (EP,US);
B29D11/00634 (EP,US);
H01L33/501 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE FARBVERÄNDERLICHE PARTIKEL UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2020/32] | English: | COATED COLOR-CONVERTING PARTICLES AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | [2020/32] | French: | PARTICULES REVÊTUES DE CONVERSION DE COULEUR ET DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 04.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12854194.3 / EP2785799 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH07305055 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0015] , [0019] - [0025]; figure 1 * [I] 2,3,5; | [XI]US2011068321 (PICKETT NIGEL [GB], et al) [X] 7,8,14 * paragraphs [0045] - [0050] - [0070] , [0117]; figures 9-14 * [I] 9-13,15-17; | [I] - MARK GREEN, "The nature of quantum dot capping ligands", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (20100401), vol. 20, no. 28, doi:10.1039/c0jm00007h, ISSN 0959-9428, page 5797, XP055072540 [I] 18-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0jm00007h |