EP3690923 - SAMPLE ANALYSIS FOR MASS CYTOMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluidigm Canada Inc. 70 Esna Park Drive, Unit 12 Markham, ON L3R 6E7 / CA | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOBODA, Alexandre 726 Yorkhill Blvd Thornhill, Ontario L4Y 5G7 / CA | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Duffield, Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20150581.5 | 17.04.2014 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | US201361812893P | 17.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361812893 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3690923 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/04, H01J49/10 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H01J49/105 (EP,US);
G01N15/10 (RU,US);
G01N15/1404 (US);
G01N15/1436 (US);
H01J49/0463 (EP,US);
G01N15/01 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROBENANALYSE FÜR MASSENZYTOMETRIE | [2020/32] | English: | SAMPLE ANALYSIS FOR MASS CYTOMETRY | [2020/32] | French: | ANALYSE D'ÉCHANTILLONS POUR CYTOMÉTRIE DE MASSE | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 05.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14784995.4 / EP2987177 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012074307 (BECKER SABINE [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,12,14 * figure 1B * * claims 1,7 *[I] 9-11,15; | [XI]US2012079894 (VAN BERKEL GARY J [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] * [I] 9-11,15 | by applicant | US2010144056 | US2012061561 | - SEUMA et al., "Combination of immunohistochemistry and laser ablation ICP mass spectrometry for imaging of cancer biomarkers", Proteomics, (20080000), vol. 8, doi:10.1002/pmic.200800167, pages 3775 - 3784, XP055014606 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pmic.200800167 | - HUTCHINSON et al., "Imaging and spatial distribution of (B-amyloid peptide and metal ions in Alzheimer's plaques by laser ablation-inductively coupled plasma-mass spectrometry", Analytical biochemistry, (20050000), vol. 346, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.ab.2005.08.024, pages 225 - 233, XP005126668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2005.08.024 | - BECKER et al., "Laser ablation inductively coupled plasma mass spectrometry (LA-ICP-MS) in elemental imaging of biological tissues and in proteomics", Journal of Analytical Atomic Spectrometry, (20070000), vol. 22.7, pages 736 - 744 | - BINET et al., "Detection and characterization of zinc- and cadmium-binding proteins in Escherichia coli by gel electrophoresis and laser ablation-inductively coupled plasma-mass spectrometry", Analytical Biochemistry, (20030000), vol. 318, doi:10.1016/S0003-2697(03)00190-8, pages 30 - 38, XP008091063 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-2697(03)00190-8 | - QUINN et al., "Simultaneous determination of proteins using an element-tagged immunoassay coupled with ICP-MS detection", Journal of Analytical Atomic Spectrometry, (20020000), vol. 17, doi:10.1039/b202306g, pages 892 - 96, XP002973532 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b202306g | - SHARMA et al., Sesbania drummondii cell cultures: ICP-MS determination of the accumulation of Pb and Cu Microchemical Journal, (20050000), vol. 81, pages 163 - 69 | - GIESEN et al., "Multiplexed immunohistochemical detection of tumor markers in breast cancer tissue using laser ablation inductively coupled plasma mass spectrometry", Anal. Chem., (20110000), vol. 83, doi:10.1021/ac2016823, pages 8177 - 8183, XP055015184 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac2016823 | - JHANIS et al., "Rapid bulk analysis using femtosecond laser ablation inductively coupled plasma time-of-flight mass spectrometry", J. Anal. At. Spectrom., (20120000), vol. 27, pages 1405 - 1412 |