EP3848940 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRIGGERING AN ACTION BASED ON A DISEASE SEVERITY OR AFFECTIVE STATE OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELLIMORE, Kiran Hamilton J. c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SAINI, Privender Kaur c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PRIORI, Rita c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
KARAMOLEGKOS, Nikolaos c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 20150644.1 | 08.01.2020 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848940 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16H80/00 (EP,US);
G16H10/20 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSLÖSUNG EINER AKTION AUF BASIS EINES KRANKHEITSGRADES ODER AFFEKTIVEN ZUSTANDS EINER PERSON | [2021/28] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRIGGERING AN ACTION BASED ON A DISEASE SEVERITY OR AFFECTIVE STATE OF A SUBJECT | [2021/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉCLENCHER UNE ACTION SUR LA BASE DE LA GRAVITÉ D'UNE MALADIE OU DE L'ÉTAT AFFECTIF D'UN SUJET | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/25] | 04.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]EP1911396 (MOSCATELLI FILIPPO [IT]) [ID] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0045] *; | [I]US2008208015 (MORRIS MARGARET E [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0014] - [0086] *; | [I]US2016125160 (HENEGHAN CONOR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0079] *; | [XI]US2018247713 (ROTHMAN STEVEN I [US]) [X] 1,2,7-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0189] * [I] 3-6,11,12 | by applicant | EP1911396 |