EP3680049 - CIRCULAR SAW BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Kenneth 272 Kibbe Road East Longmeadow, MA 01028 / US | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 20151380.1 | 13.01.2020 | [2020/29] | Priority number, date | US201962792096P | 14.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962792096 P | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680049 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/02 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
B23D61/021 (EP,US);
B23D61/025 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREISSÄGEBLÄTTER | [2020/29] | English: | CIRCULAR SAW BLADES | [2020/29] | French: | LAMES DE SCIE CIRCULAIRE | [2020/29] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 07.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPS51141881U (-) [X] 1,4-6,8-10 * the whole document * * in particular: * * figure 2 * [Y] 12-15 [I] 2,3,7,11; | [Y]US5038653 (SLOCUM GERALD F [US], et al) [Y] 12-14 * column 4, line 19 - line 55 * * column 7, line 6 - line 26 * * figures 1,4 *; | [Y]EP2481509 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0014] * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPS531186U (-) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * figure 6 * | by applicant | US9821390 |