EP3848720 - GUIDED WAVE RADAR LEVEL GAUGE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE GUIDED WAVE RADAR LEVEL GAUGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount Tank Radar AB Box 150 435 23 Mölnlycke / SE | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSSON, Mikael Ludvigsdalsvägen 16 593 52 Västervik / SE | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 20151410.6 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848720 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/28, G01S13/88, H01Q1/22, H01Q13/02 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G01S13/88 (EP,US);
G01F23/284 (CN,US);
G01S13/103 (US);
G01S13/24 (US);
G01S7/28 (EP);
H01Q1/225 (EP,US);
H01Q13/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WELLENGEFÜHRTES FÜLLSTANDMESSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES WELLENGEFÜHRTEN FÜLLSTANDMESSGERÄTS | [2021/28] | English: | GUIDED WAVE RADAR LEVEL GAUGE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE GUIDED WAVE RADAR LEVEL GAUGE | [2021/28] | French: | JAUGE DE NIVEAU RADAR À ONDES GUIDÉES ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE LA JAUGE DE NIVEAU RADAR À ONDES GUIDÉES | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 20.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005179584 (OHLSSON MAGNUS [SE]); | [XI]EP3029434 (ROSEMOUNT TANK RADAR AB [SE]); | [XI]US2018328771 (EDVARDSSON OLOV [SE]) | by applicant | US2002026828 |