EP3702133 - BUILD PLATE CLAMPING-ASSEMBLY AND ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF ADDITIVELY PRINTING ON WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEDYK, Glen Charles General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 02 /
SHI, Jinjie General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 03 /
HAMPSHIRE, Joseph Edward General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 04 /
WORTHING, Jr., Richard Roy General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 20151855.2 | 14.01.2020 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | US201916261861 | 30.01.2019 Original published format: US201916261861 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702133 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/245, B33Y30/00, B22F3/105 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
B33Y30/00 (EP,CN,US);
B29C64/245 (EP,CN);
B23K26/142 (US);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,US);
B22F10/68 (CN);
B22F10/73 (EP,US);
B22F10/85 (CN);
B22F12/30 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/82 (EP,US);
B22F12/90 (EP,US);
B23K26/0006 (US);
B23K26/032 (US);
B23K26/042 (US);
B23K26/0861 (US);
B23K26/342 (US);
B23P6/007 (US);
B25B5/003 (US);
B29C64/153 (CN);
B29C64/35 (CN);
B29C64/393 (CN);
B29C73/24 (EP);
B33Y40/00 (CN);
B33Y50/02 (CN);
F16B21/165 (US);
B22F10/12 (EP,US);
B22F10/14 (EP,US);
B22F10/18 (EP,US);
B22F10/25 (EP,US);
B22F10/80 (EP,US);
B22F12/44 (EP,US);
B22F12/49 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (US);
B23K26/702 (US);
| C-Set: |
B25B5/006, B33Y10/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBAUPLATTENSPANNUNGSANORDNUNG UND GENERATIVE FERTIGUNGSSYSTEME SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM GENERATIVEN DRUCKEN AUF WERKSTÜCKEN | [2020/36] | English: | BUILD PLATE CLAMPING-ASSEMBLY AND ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF ADDITIVELY PRINTING ON WORKPIECES | [2020/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE SERRAGE DE PLAQUE DE CONSTRUCTION ET SYSTÈMES DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE ET PROCÉDÉS D'IMPRESSION ADDITIVE SUR DES PIÈCES | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 17.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102012011217 (CL SCHUTZRECHTSVERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]WO2014172496 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2A * * figure 3 * * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 12 *; | [A]EP3103569 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * figures 4,6,7 *; | [A]EP3156152 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0051] ** figure 3 *; | [A]US2018363691 (GUNNER JON PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * figure 2A *; | [IA]DE102017115989 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [I] 11-14 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * figures 4,5,6 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0003] * [A] 1-10,15 |