EP3696186 - DNA-BINDING PROTEIN USING PPR MOTIF, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyushu University, National University Corporation 10-1, Hakozaki, 6-chome Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | For all designated states Hiroshima University 3-2 Kagamiyama 1-chome Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 739-8511 / JP | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Takashi c/o Graduate School of Science, Hirosima University 3-1 Kagamiyama 1-chome Higashihiroshima-shi Hiroshima, 739-8526 / JP | 02 /
Sakuma, Tetsushi c/o Graduate School of Science, Hirosima University 3-1 Kagamiyama 1-chome Higashihiroshima-shi Hiroshima, 739-8526 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Takahiro c/o Kyushu University, National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku, Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka, 812-8581 / JP | 04 /
Yagi, Yusuke c/o Kyushu University, National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku, Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka, 812-8581 / JP | 05 /
Okawa, Yasuyuki c/o Kyushu University, National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku, Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka, 812-8581 / JP | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 20151941.0 | 22.04.2014 | [2020/34] | Priority number, date | JP20130089840 | 22.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013089840 | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3696186 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3696186 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K4/10, C07K14/415, C07K19/00, C12N9/16, C12Q1/68, C12N9/22, C12N15/82 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8213 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8216 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8217 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/85 (US);
C12N9/22 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DNA-BINDENDES PROTEIN MIT PPR-MOTIV UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/34] | English: | DNA-BINDING PROTEIN USING PPR MOTIF, AND USE THEREOF | [2020/34] | French: | PROTÉINE DE LIAISON À L'ADN UTILISANT UN MOTIF PPR ET SON UTILISATION | [2020/34] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 15.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14787853.2 / EP3020722 | Divisional application(s) | EP24196660.5 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2011111829 (UNIV KYUSHU NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al); | [D]US2017260242 (NAKAMURA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | by applicant | WO2011072246 | WO2011111829 | JP2011242250 | WO2012JP77274 |