EP3852163 - HOUSING, BATTERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20 Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röpke, Stefan Leberackerweg 10 8041 Graz / AT | 02 /
Blatesic, Danijel Fröbelgasse 23 8020 Graz / AT | 03 /
Wünsche, Ralph Kastellfeldgasse 50 8010 Graz / AT | 04 /
Röck, Alexander Seizerstr. 9 8793 Trofaiach / AT | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 20152607.6 | 20.01.2020 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852163 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/653, H01M10/6554 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
H01M10/613 (EP,CN);
H01M10/625 (EP,CN);
H01M10/653 (EP);
H01M10/6554 (EP,CN);
H01M10/6556 (CN);
H01M50/20 (EP);
H01M10/643 (EP);
H01M10/647 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP,CN);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE, BATTERIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEHÄUSES | [2021/29] | English: | HOUSING, BATTERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A HOUSING | [2021/29] | French: | BOÎTIER, SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN BOÎTIER | [2021/29] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 19.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010330404 (NISHINO HAJIME [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0066] , [ 126] *; | [XI]WO2012133709 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15 * figure 22 *[I] 13; | [Y]EP3588666 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0144] - [0151]; figure 18 * |