EP3686053 - VEHICLE FOR LIFTING, TRANSPORTING AND LOWERING LOAD CARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behling, Jan Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | 02 /
Rotgeri, Mathias Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Jochen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 18 44141 Dortmund / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 20153188.6 | 22.01.2020 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | DE201910101857 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019101857 | [2020/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686053 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686053 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/02, // B66F9/06, B66F9/075, B66F9/065 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
B60P1/025 (EP);
B60P1/483 (US);
B60P1/027 (EP,US);
B60P1/4421 (US);
B60P3/00 (US);
B66F9/063 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG ZUM ANHEBEN, TRANSPORTIEREN UND ABSENKEN VON LADUNGSTRÄGERN | [2020/31] | English: | VEHICLE FOR LIFTING, TRANSPORTING AND LOWERING LOAD CARRIERS | [2020/31] | French: | VÉHICULE DE LEVAGE, DE TRANSPORT ET D'ABAISSEMENT DES PORTEURS DE CHARGE | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 21.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2020 | AL | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | MK | 29.09.2021 | MT | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SE | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | TR | 29.09.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IE | 22.01.2022 | LU | 22.01.2022 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.01.2020 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
TR | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 22.01.2020 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IE | 22.01.2022 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
LU | 22.01.2022 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3543429 (HOOCK MANFRED, et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 51 ** figures 1-5 *; | [A]US7543671 (DONALDSON JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 49 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2018130315 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 27 - page 8, line 7 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2018251145 (DUNIGAN ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-4,12,16 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 1,2,3 * | by applicant | GB262560 |