EP3708801 - TURBOCHARGER TURBINE WASTEGATE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garrett Transportation I Inc. 2525 W. 190th St. Torrance, CA 90504 / US | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMANEC, Filip c/o GARRETT TRANSPORTATION I INC 2525 West 190th Street Torrance, CA 90504 / US | 02 /
FORBELSKY, Antonin c/o GARRETT TRANSPORTATION I INC 2525 West 190th Street Torrance, CA 90504 / US | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House, Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 20153332.0 | 23.01.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | US201916298690 | 11.03.2019 Original published format: US201916298690 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708801 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/18 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
F02B37/186 (EP,US);
F02B37/22 (CN);
F01D17/105 (US);
F01D17/145 (CN);
F16H21/44 (US);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BYPASSVENTILANORDNUNG EINER TURBOLADERTURBINE | [2020/38] | English: | TURBOCHARGER TURBINE WASTEGATE ASSEMBLY | [2020/38] | French: | ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE DE DÉCHARGE DE TURBINE DE TURBOCOMPRESSEUR | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5146753 (POTTER MICHAEL A [US]); | [XYI]US2003196435 (HEATH WILLIAM DALE [US]); | [Y]DE102008032927 (BOSCH MAHLE TURBO SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE102013011106 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) |