EP3730693 - PRESS FELT WITH A THREAD LAYER AND A CARRIER FLEECE PROVIDED ON THE MACHINE SIDE OR THE PAPER SIDE OF THE THREAD LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heimbach GmbH An Gut Nazareth 73 52353 Düren / DE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLLS, Christian Kolpingstraße 23 52078 Aachen / DE | 02 /
PIRIG, Jochen Berresfeldweg 18 52385 Nideggen / DE | 03 /
TELGMANN, Dieter Niederdrove 12 52372 Kreuzau / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Ralf Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 20153488.0 | 24.01.2020 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | DE201920102306U | 24.04.2019 Original published format: DE 202019102306 U | [2020/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730693 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D21F7/08 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
D21F7/083 (EP,CN);
B32B5/02 (CN);
B32B33/00 (CN);
B32B5/022 (CN);
B32B5/06 (CN);
B32B5/26 (CN);
B32B7/022 (CN);
D04H1/4334 (CN);
D04H1/4391 (CN);
D04H1/541 (CN);
D04H3/009 (CN);
D04H3/016 (CN);
D04H3/147 (CN);
B32B2250/05 (CN);
B32B2250/20 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRESSFILZ MIT EINEM FADENGELEGE UND EINEM AUF DER MASCHINENSEITE ODER DER PAPIERSEITE DES FADENGELEGES VORGESEHENEN TRÄGERVLIES | [2020/44] | English: | PRESS FELT WITH A THREAD LAYER AND A CARRIER FLEECE PROVIDED ON THE MACHINE SIDE OR THE PAPER SIDE OF THE THREAD LAYER | [2020/44] | French: | FEUTRE DE PRESSE DOTÉ D'UNE NAPPE DE FILS ET D'UN SUPPORT NON-TISSÉ SITUÉ CÔTÉ MACHINE OU CÔTÉ PAPIER DE LA NAPPE DE FILS | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 06.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 22.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102011004568 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0019] - [0031] - [0033]; figures 1-3c *; | [X]EP1719834 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,11-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0043] - [0047] - [0056] - [0066] - [0069]; figure - *; | [X]EP1357223 (HEIMBACH GMBH THOMAS JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0023]; figure - * |