EP3661160 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING MEDIA AND MEDIA TRANSFER BETWEEN DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Malikie Innovations Limited The Glasshouses GH2 92 Georges Street Lower Dun Laoghaire, Dublin A96 VR66 / IE | [2024/22] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Andrew c/o 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 047 / CA | 02 /
Bakker, Jan Hendrik Lucas c/o 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 047 / CA | 03 /
Buckley, Adrian c/o 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 04 /
Cormier, Jean-Phillipe c/o 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 05 /
Kim, Young Ae c/o 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2020/23] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 20153712.3 | 30.04.2010 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | US200917540309P | 04.05.2009 Original published format: US 17540309 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661160 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3661160 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/403, H04L67/14, H04W4/70 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H04L12/1818 (EP,US);
H04B7/24 (KR);
H04L65/40 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/4046 (US);
H04L12/1822 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04L65/1104 (CN);
H04L65/403 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,CN,US);
H04W68/02 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L12/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG VON MEDIEN UND MEDIENTRANSFER ZWISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/23] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING MEDIA AND MEDIA TRANSFER BETWEEN DEVICES | [2020/23] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN UVRE ET DE TRANSFERT MULTIMÉDIA ENTRE DES DISPOSITIFS | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 11.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10719169.4 / EP2428016 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - RESEARCH IN MOTION, "Transfer for Media modifications", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-090934-23838-030-EDITS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090210), no. Budapest; 20090210, XP050333376 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; IP multimedia call control protocol based on Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) and Session Description Protocol (SDP); Stage 3 (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 24.229, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090301), no. V8.7.0, pages 1 - 618, XP050365040 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [5.1.1.2.1] - paragraph [5.1.3] * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and Architecture; IP Multimedia Subsystem (IMS) Service Continuity; Stage 2 (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.237, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090301), no. V9.0.0, pages 1 - 41, XP050363377 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [6.3.1.2] - paragraph [6.3.2] * |