EP3782608 - METHOD FOR ENHANCING PASSENGER MOLECULE LOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NuVessl Inc. 2020, 250 5th Street SW Calgary, Alberta T2P 0R4 / CA | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYNOLDS, Jeffery S. 8916 Arabella Lane Seminole, Florida 33777 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Mummery, Thomas Zack Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 20153737.0 | 24.01.2020 | [2021/08] | Priority number, date | US201962890940P | 23.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962890940 P | US201916705523 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: US201916705523 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782608 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107, A61K9/51, A61K47/10, A61K47/24, A61K47/26, A61K47/44, A61K31/00, A61K36/00 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61K31/05 (EP);
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K36/185 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/006 (EP);
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/24 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER BELADUNG EINES PASSAGIERMOLEKÜLS | [2021/08] | English: | METHOD FOR ENHANCING PASSENGER MOLECULE LOADING | [2021/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE CHARGEMENT DE MOLÉCULES DE PASSAGERS | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 24.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018296493 (KAUFMAN RICHARD CLARK [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 2, paragraphs 0020-0026 * * page 7, paragraph 0099 - page 8, paragraph 0112 * * page 11, paragraph 0181 - page 12, paragraph 0194 * * paragraphs [0211] , [ 0213] , [ 0223] , [ 0236] * * example - *; | [I]WO2018061007 (YISSUM RES DEV CO OF HEBREW UNIV JERUSALEM LTD [IL]) [I] 1-15 * page 9, paragraph 5 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 21, paragraph last * * tables 7-2 * * claim - * | by applicant | US8597678 | US8545574 | US8545575 | US9480650 | US9364434 | US9399015 | US9897234 |