EP3764174 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MODULE ENGINNERING WITH SEQUENCE LIBRARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cu-Unjieng, Mark Anthony De Castro c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | 02 /
Hirooka, Isao c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | 03 /
Murata, Hideki c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | 04 /
Lin, Naing Oo c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | 05 /
Orido, Archie Sambitan c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | 06 /
Mori, Takeshi c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | 07 /
Supiman, Efendi c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | 08 /
Yu, Thin Sapal c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | 09 /
Tria, Janet c/o Yokogawa Engineering Asia Pte. Ltd. 5-Bedok South Road Singapore 469270 / SG | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 20153750.3 | 24.01.2020 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | US201916508584 | 11.07.2019 Original published format: US201916508584 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764174 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/418 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
G06F16/23 (CN);
G06F30/00 (US);
G05B19/41845 (EP);
G06F16/21 (CN);
G05B2219/23261 (EP);
G05B2219/25067 (EP);
G05B2219/31104 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33125 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODUL-MANIPULATION MIT SEQUENZBIBLIOTHEKEN | [2021/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MODULE ENGINNERING WITH SEQUENCE LIBRARIES | [2021/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INGÉNIERIE DE MODULE AVEC DES BIBLIOTHÈQUES DE SÉQUENCES | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 28.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/15] | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009118846 (ELDRIDGE KEITH [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0121] *; | [XI]EP3021181 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-11,13,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0201]; figures 2A-14 * [I] 4-7,12 |