EP3719544 - DIFFRACTIVE TRIFOCAL LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Arizona Board Of Regents On Behalf Of The University Of Arizona University Services Bldg. Room 204 888 N. Euclid Avenue P.O. Box 210158 Tucson, AZ 85721-0158 / US | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWIEGERLING, James, T. 5771 N. Placita Angelica Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20154708.0 | 12.02.2010 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | US20090207409P | 12.02.2009 Original published format: US 207409 P | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719544 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/10, G02C7/06, G02C7/04, G02B5/18, A61F2/16, // A61F2/14 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
A61F2/1618 (EP,KR,US);
G02B3/10 (KR);
G02C7/041 (KR,US);
A61F2/1451 (US);
A61F2/1613 (US);
A61F2/1656 (EP,US);
G02B5/1876 (EP,KR,US);
G02C7/028 (US);
G02C7/042 (EP,US);
G02C7/044 (EP,US);
G02C7/049 (US);
A61F2/14 (EP,US);
G02C2202/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2020/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DIFFRAKTIVE TRIFOKALE LINSE | [2020/41] | English: | DIFFRACTIVE TRIFOCAL LENS | [2020/41] | French: | VERRE TRIPLE FOYER À DIFFRACTION | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 07.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10741835.2 / EP2396683 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4210391 (COHEN ALLEN L [US]); | [A]US5117306 (COHEN ALLEN L [US]) | by applicant | US5344447 | US7441894 |