EP3736894 - BIPOLAR PLATE FOR FUEL CELLS, FUEL CELL STACK COMPRISING SUCH BIPOLAR PLATES AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH A FUEL CELL STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG Auto-Union-Str. 1 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jilani, Adel c/o Ballard Power Systems, 9000 Glenlyon Parkway Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5J8 / CA | 02 /
Kumar, Sanjiv c/o Ballard Power Systems, 9000 Glenlyon Parkway Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5J8 / CA | 03 /
Bradean, Radu P. c/o Ballard Power Systems, 9000 Glenlyon Parkway Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5J8 / CA | 04 /
Voigt, Sebastian Jägerhausstr. 11 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 20155267.6 | 04.02.2020 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | DE201910205564 | 17.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019205564 | [2020/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736894 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3736894 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0206, H01M8/0213, H01M8/0228, H01M8/0254, H01M8/0258, H01M8/0265 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
H01M8/0265 (EP,CN);
H01M8/0258 (EP,CN,US);
B60L53/54 (CN);
H01M8/0206 (EP);
H01M8/0213 (EP);
H01M8/0228 (EP);
H01M8/0254 (EP);
H01M8/0267 (US);
H01M8/04029 (US);
H01M8/04701 (US);
H01M8/2465 (CN);
H01M8/2483 (US);
H01M2250/20 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2020/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BIPOLARPLATTE FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN, BRENNSTOFFZELLENSTAPEL MIT SOLCHEN BIPOLARPLATTEN SOWIE FAHRZEUG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN BRENNSTOFFZELLENSTAPEL | [2020/46] | English: | BIPOLAR PLATE FOR FUEL CELLS, FUEL CELL STACK COMPRISING SUCH BIPOLAR PLATES AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH A FUEL CELL STACK | [2020/46] | French: | PLAQUE BIPOLAIRE POUR PILES À COMBUSTIBLE, EMPILEMENT DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE DOTÉ DE TELLES PLAQUES BIPOLAIRES AINSI QUE VÉHICULE DOTÉ D'UN TEL EMPILEMENT DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 01.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2020 | AL | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | ES | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | IT | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | MT | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | IE | 04.02.2022 | LU | 04.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 04.02.2020 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.02.2022 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | ES | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 11.08.2021 | |
NO | 11.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003162078 (KIKUCHI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10328039 (REINZ DICHTUNGS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 45] - [0038]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE112006003413T (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]DE102016121506 (AUDI AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |