EP3681155 - HIGH LUMINANCE PROJECTION DISPLAYS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corp. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMBERG, Gerwin 4959 Manor Street Vancouver, BC V5R 3Y1 / CA | 02 /
RICHARDS, Martin J. c/o Dolby Laboratories, Inc. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 03 /
CRAIG, Todd c/o Dolby Laboratories, Inc. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Application number, filing date | 20155382.3 | 11.04.2012 | [2020/29] | Priority number, date | US201161476949P | 19.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161476949 P | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681155 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, G03H1/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H04N9/3147 (EP,CN,US);
H04N9/31 (KR);
G03B21/00 (KR);
G03H1/0005 (EP,US);
G03H1/0891 (US);
G03H1/16 (US);
G03H1/2249 (US);
G03H1/2294 (EP,US);
G06T11/001 (US);
H04N5/74 (KR);
H04N9/3161 (EP,CN,US);
H04N9/3182 (EP,CN,US);
G03H2001/0088 (US);
G03H2001/221 (EP);
G03H2001/2215 (EP);
G03H2001/2221 (EP);
G03H2001/2284 (EP,US);
G03H2225/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSANZEIGEN MIT HOHER LEUCHTKRAFT UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2020/29] | English: | HIGH LUMINANCE PROJECTION DISPLAYS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2020/29] | French: | AFFICHAGES DE PROJECTION DE LUMINANCE ÉLEVÉE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/29] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12717526.3 / EP2700235 | EP18156451.9 / EP3364651 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6011874 (GLUECKSTAD JESPER [JP]); | [Y]GB2438472 (LIGHT BLUE OPTICS LTD [GB]); | [Y]WO2010125367 (LIGHT BLUE OPTICS LTD [GB], et al) | by applicant | WO2008140787 | US7784938 | WO2011002757 |