EP3705310 - RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TIRE, AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENTARO, Nakamura c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD., 6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 20155531.5 | 05.02.2020 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | JP20190039537 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019039537 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705310 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L9/06 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP);
B60C1/00 (EP);
C08L9/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K5/435 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR REIFEN SOWIE REIFEN | [2020/37] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TIRE, AND TIRE | [2020/37] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR PNEUMATIQUE ET PNEUMATIQUE | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 23.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2016194018 ; | [XI]US2012041129 (STEINHAUSER NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * tables 1,4 * [I] 4; | [XI]US2015118429 (STEINHAUSER NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * tables 1,2 *[I] 4; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 79, Database accession no. 2016-70698D, XP002799716 & JP2016194018 A 20161117 (TOYO RUBBER IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * claim - * | by applicant | JP2010111753 | WO2013125614 |