EP3696579 - A METHOD OF PROJECTING LIGHT RADIATION AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAY PAKY S.R.L. Via Pastrengo, 3/B 24068 Seriate (BG) / IT | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states CLAY PAKY S.p.A. Via Pastrengo, 3/B 24068 Seriate (BG) / IT | ||
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Straße 6 80807 München / DE | ||
For all designated states CLAY PAKY S.p.A. Via Pastrengo, 3/B 24068 Seriate / IT | |||
For:IT
OSRAM S.P.A. - SOCIETA' RIUNITE OSRAM EDISON CLERICI Via Sant'Uguzzone, 29 20126 Milano / IT | |||
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Straße 6 80807 München / DE | ||
For all designated states CLAY PAKY S.p.A. Via Pastrengo, 3/B 24068 Seriate / IT | |||
For:IT
OSRAM S.P.A. - SOCIETA' RIUNITE OSRAM EDISON CLERICI Viale dell'Innovazione, 3 20126 Milano / IT | |||
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | ||
For all designated states CLAY PAKY S.p.A. Via Pastrengo, 3/B 24068 Seriate / IT | |||
For:IT
OSRAM S.P.A. - SOCIETA' RIUNITE OSRAM EDISON CLERICI Viale dell'Innovazione, 3 20126 Milano / IT | |||
Former [2020/34] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
CLAY PAKY S.p.A. Via Pastrengo, 3/B 24068 Seriate / IT | |||
For:IT
OSRAM S.P.A. - SOCIETA' RIUNITE OSRAM EDISON CLERICI Viale dell'Innovazione, 3 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGELINI, Mr. Marco Via Roma, 67 I-27020 Trivolzio (Pavia) / IT | 02 /
FRISON, Mr. Renato Viale della Libertà, 9 I-33083 Chions (Pordenone) / IT | 03 /
ALFIER, Mr. Alberto Via Fiume, 22 I-31050 Vedelago (Treviso) / IT | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 20155570.3 | 05.02.2020 | [2020/34] | Priority number, date | IT20190002071 | 13.02.2019 Original published format: IT201900002071 | [2020/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3696579 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3696579 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/04, F21V13/12, F21V14/00, F21W131/406, F21Y115/10, G02B5/02, F21S10/00, G02B19/00 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G02B5/0205 (EP);
F21S10/007 (EP);
F21V13/12 (EP);
F21V14/006 (EP);
G02B19/0028 (EP);
G02B19/0047 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/34] | G02B5/02, F21S10/00, F21V14/06, G02B19/00, F21V3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PROJEKTION VON LICHTSTRAHLUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/34] | English: | A METHOD OF PROJECTING LIGHT RADIATION AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE | [2020/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROJECTION D'UN RAYONNEMENT LUMINEUX ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2020/34] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6206544 (COSTA PAUL D [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * Column 1, Lines 18-19; Column 4, Line 61 to Column 5, Line 34; Column 5, Line 65 to Column 6, Line 44; Column 7, Line 24 to Column 8, Line 9; Column 9, Line 38 to Column 10, Line 30 * * figures 1-9 *[Y] 10,11; | [XY]EP1293722 (MARUMO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * Paragraphs [0001]-[0002], [0015], [0021]-[0022], [0032]-[0033], [0044]-[0046], [0046]-[0054], [0056]-[0059], [0067]-[0070] * * figures 1-13 * [Y] 10,11 |