EP3736793 - LIFTING LOCK AND LED DISPLAY SCREEN WITH THE LIFTING LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilumin Group Co. Ltd. No. 112 Yongfu Road Qiaotou Village Fuyong Town Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518103 / CN | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dai, Xiaotian 112, Yongfu Rd, Qiaotou Village, Fuyong Town Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518103 / CN | 02 /
Li, Jinxing 112, Yongfu Rd, Qiaotou Village, Fuyong Town Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518103 / CN | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Osterhoff, Utz Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstraße 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 20155574.5 | 05.02.2020 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | CN201920639099U | 05.05.2019 Original published format: CN 201920639099 U | [2020/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736793 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/302 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
G09F9/3026 (EP);
F16M11/041 (US);
G06F1/1601 (US);
H05K7/1414 (US);
G06F2200/1613 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HUBSPERRE UND LED-BILDSCHIRM MIT HUBSPERRE | [2020/46] | English: | LIFTING LOCK AND LED DISPLAY SCREEN WITH THE LIFTING LOCK | [2020/46] | French: | VERROU DE LEVAGE ET ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE À DEL DOTÉ DU VERROU DE LEVAGE | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 12.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/42] | 04.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP3319072 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1,3,8-10 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0113] * * figures 1-10 * [Y] 2,4-7,11-15; | [Y]CN109469674 (SHENZHEN GLOSHINE TECH CO LTD) [Y] 2,4-6,11-14 * abstract *; | [Y]EP3196486 (SHENZHEN LEYARD OPTO-ELECTRONIC CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 7,15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-16 *; | [A]CN108039123 (GUANGZHOU GAOBOLIN ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-7,9-15 * abstract * |