EP3666275 - COMBINATION THERAPY WITH AN ANTITUMOR ALKALOID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharma Mar, S.A. Avda. de los Reyes, 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte 28770 Colmenar Viejo, Madrid / ES | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONEO OCAÑA, Victoria Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo, Madrid / ES | 02 /
SANTAMARÍA NÚÑEZ, Gema Pharma Mar, S.A. Avda. de los Reyes, 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo, Madrid / ES | 03 /
GARCÍA FERNÁNDEZ, Luis Francisco Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo, Madrid / ES | 04 /
GALMARINI, Carlos María Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo, Madrid / ES | 05 /
GUILLÉN NAVARRO, María José Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo, Madrid / ES | 06 /
AVILÉS MARÍN, Pablo Manuel Pharma Mar, S.A Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo, Madrid / ES | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 20155618.0 | 11.11.2011 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | EP20100382300 | 12.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10382300 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3666275 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3666275 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4995, A61K31/69, A61K45/06, A61K38/15, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61K31/513, A61K31/519, A61K31/7068 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/4995 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/34 (RU);
A61K31/395 (RU);
A61K31/4164 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4375 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,KR,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/15 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4995, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT EINEM ANTITUMORALEN ALKALOID | [2020/25] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY WITH AN ANTITUMOR ALKALOID | [2020/25] | French: | THÉRAPIE DE COMBINAISON AVEC UN ALCALOÏDE ANTITUMORAL | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11781807.0 / EP2637663 | EP14175282.4 / EP2786756 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1806349 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES]) [Y] 1-6,14,15 * p. 19, compound 27; paragraphs [0037], [0063]-[0071] *; | [A]WO2009140675 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [A] 1-6,14,15 * claim 13 *; | [Y] - JFM LEAL ET AL, "PM01183, a new DNA minor groove covalent binder with potent in vitro and in vivo anti-tumour activity", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (20100702), vol. 161, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1476-5381.2010.00945.x, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1099 - 1110, XP055013260 [Y] 1-6,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2010.00945.x | [Y] - Manuel M Paz, "Antitumour Antibiotics", Anticancer Therapeutics, (20080101), doi:10.1002/9780470697047.ch8, ISBN 978-0-47-072303-6, XP055139812 [Y] 1-6,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9780470697047.ch8 | [Y] - G. MINOTTI, "Anthracyclines: Molecular Advances and Pharmacologic Developments in Antitumor Activity and Cardiotoxicity", PHARMACOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (20040601), vol. 56, no. 2, doi:10.1124/pr.56.2.6, ISSN 0031-6997, pages 185 - 229, XP055139671 [Y] 1-6,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/pr.56.2.6 | [XP] - José Guillén ET AL, "In vivo combination studies of PM01183 with alkylating, antimetabolites, DNA-topoisomerase inhibitors and tubulin binding agents", (20110405), URL: http://www.abstractsonline.com/Plan/ViewAbstract.aspx?sKey=17ec9ca9-693a-4df8-8e8c-857ab3e72dc7&cKey=09c40d0f-78d3-44d9-bac5-c1117328e5c6&mKey={507D311A-B6EC-436A-BD67-6D14ED39622C}, (20120307), XP055021187 [XP] 1-6,14,15 * the whole document * | [T] - E Calvo, "Lurbinectedin (PM01183) in combination with doxorubicin (DOX): Preliminary results of a phase Ib study", European Journal of Cancer, Volume 49 Supplement 2, (20130901), URL: http://2013.europeancancercongress.org/Scientific-Programme/Abstract-search?abstractid=5425, (20140911), XP055139614 [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0187894 | WO03001427 | WO03014127 | WO2004035613 | WO2006046079 | - LEAL JFM et al., Br. J. Pharmacol., (20100000), vol. 161, pages 1099 - 1110 | - CHOU T.C., Pharmacol. Rev., (20060000), vol. 58, pages 621 - 681 | - CHOUTALALAY, Adv. Enzyme Regul., (19840000), vol. 22, pages 27 - 55 |