EP3862504 - GUTTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/32] | GUTTER BRACKET AND SYSTEM | ||
[2023/17] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rautaruukki Oyj Panuntie 11 00620 Helsinki / FI | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Przemyslaw, Falek c/o Rautaruukki Oyj Panuntie 11 00620 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Michal, Dyda c/o Rautaruukki Oyj Panuntie 11 00620 Helsinki / FI | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 20156057.0 | 07.02.2020 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3862504 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3862504 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/072 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
E04D13/0722 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RINNENSYSTEM | [2023/17] | English: | GUTTER SYSTEM | [2023/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GOUTTIÈRE | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/32] | RINNENHALTER UND SYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/32] | GUTTER BRACKET AND SYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/32] | SUPPORT DE GOUTTIÈRE ET SYSTÈME | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/25] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US166905 (STOHLER) [A] 3,4 * figure - *; | [X]JPS60159129U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,6,7,9 * figures 1-2 *; | [XY]WO9619624 (KEYTOWN PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * figure 1 * [Y] 8,10,12; | [Y]US5862631 (ATTAWAY JULIAN J [US], et al) [Y] 10,12* figures 1-2 *; | [Y]WO2017009590 (DOOLEY JACK [GB]) [Y] 8 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]JP6277244B (OTIS CO LTD) [A] 3,4 * figure - * |