EP3712748 - HEADS-UP DISPLAY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/44] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Nigel John c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 10 Great Marlborough Street London, W1F 7LP / GB | 02 /
WALKER, Andrew William c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 10 Great Marlborough Street London, W1F 7LP / GB | 03 /
CLARKE, Jake Leigh c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 10 Great Marlborough Street London, W1F 7LP / GB | 04 /
STARKEY, Robert Christopher c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 10 Great Marlborough Street London, W1F 7LP / GB | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20156162.8 | 07.02.2020 | [2020/39] | Priority number, date | GB20190003738 | 19.03.2019 Original published format: GB 201903738 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712748 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3712748 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G02B27/01, G06F1/16 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP,GB,US);
G02B27/0093 (GB);
A63F13/26 (US);
G02B27/017 (GB);
G06F1/163 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/012 (US);
G06F3/0481 (GB);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06T2210/36 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | HEAD-UP-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2020/39] | English: | HEADS-UP DISPLAY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2020/39] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE TÊTE HAUTE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 10.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
IT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013112603 (VAUGHT BEN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0 43] * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 5; | [Y]US2016085301 (LOPEZ JAVIER SAN AGUSTIN [DK]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] ** paragraph [0055] *; | [X]WO2017075100 (PILLANTAS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9,10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0 38] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0048] * * figures 1A, 1B, 4, 5A, 5B, 6A, 6B, 7A * | Examination | US2017235360 |