EP3696428 - FASTENER CLIP WITH STABILIZING SHOULDER TABS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Termax LLC 1155 Rose Road Lake Zurich, Il 60047 / US | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dickinson, Daniel James 20697 N. Weiland Road Lincolnshire, IL Illinois 60069 / US | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 20156167.7 | 07.02.2020 | [2020/34] | Priority number, date | US201962804321P | 12.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962804321 P | US202016739111 | 09.01.2020 Original published format: US202016739111 | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3696428 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3696428 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/08, F16B21/07, F16B5/06, F16B2/24 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
F16B5/0621 (EP,CN);
F16B2/22 (CN);
F16B2/241 (EP);
F16B2/243 (CN);
F16B21/07 (CN);
F16B21/075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSKLAMMER MIT STABILISIERENDEN SCHULTERLASCHEN | [2020/34] | English: | FASTENER CLIP WITH STABILIZING SHOULDER TABS | [2020/34] | French: | ATTACHE DE FIXATION COMPORTANT DES PATTES D'ÉPAULE STABILISATRICES | [2020/34] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 17.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006254032 (GIBBONS MATTHEW H [US], et al); | [A]WO2010104653 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US], et al); | [I]US2013340216 (SMITH MICHAEL WALTER [US], et al); | [A]WO2017164967 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) |