EP3725694 - DEVICE FOR EMPTYING BULK MATERIAL FROM A CONTAINER IN A SLOPED CONTAINER BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Engelsmann AG Frankenthaler Straße 137-141 67059 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2024/35] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states J. Engelsmann AG Frankenthaler Straße 137-141 67059 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states J. Engelsmann AG Frankenthaler Straße 137-141 67059 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | ||
For all designated states Sartorius, Peter Feldbergstrasse 84 68163 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiehl, Marc Dürckheimer Str.114 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Kretzu, Christian Engelsmann Gustav-Fröhlich-Strasse 2 67480 Edenkoben / DE | 03 /
Bastone, Gianluca Rossinistrasse 7 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Quihdt, Viktor Berliner Str. 7 67433 Neustadt an der Weinstrasse / DE | 05 /
Liedtke, Joachim Steubenstr. 54 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Habermann Intellectual Property Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Dolivostraße 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2024/35] |
Former [2020/43] | Sartorius, Peter Patentanwalt Feldbergstrasse 84 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 20156441.6 | 10.02.2020 | [2020/43] | Priority number, date | DE201910110413 | 18.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019110413 | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3725694 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3725694 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B65G69/183 (EP);
B65B69/0083 (EP);
B65G65/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] |
Former [2020/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLEEREN VON SCHÜTTGÜTERN AUS EINEN BEHÄLTER IN EINEN SCHLAUFÖRMIGEN BEHÄLTERSACK | [2020/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR EMPTYING BULK MATERIAL FROM A CONTAINER IN A SLOPED CONTAINER BAG | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR VIDER DES MATIÈRES EN VRAC D'UN RÉCIPIENT DANS UN RÉCIPIENT EN PENTE | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 18.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP3041749 (RUBITEC AG [CH]) | by applicant | EP3041749 |