EP3709475 - HOLDING ELEMENT FOR A BATTERY AND BATTERY WITH SUCH A HOLDING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mehlo, Dennis Elsa-Braendstroem-Strasse 32 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
Koeder, Thilo Bruhweg 12 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 03 /
Schnizer, Lukas Charlottenstrasse 107/3 72764 Reutlingen / DE | 04 /
Bayer, Lisa Lindenstrasse 3 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20156781.5 | 12.02.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | DE201910203541 | 15.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019203541 | [2020/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709475 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
H02J7/0048 (EP);
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTEELEMENT FÜR EINEN AKKUMULATOR SOWIE AKKUMULATOR MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN HALTEELEMENT | [2020/38] | English: | HOLDING ELEMENT FOR A BATTERY AND BATTERY WITH SUCH A HOLDING ELEMENT | [2020/38] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE MAINTIEN POUR UN ACCUMULATEUR AINSI QU'ACCUMULATEUR DOTÉ D'UN TEL ÉLÉMENT DE MAINTIEN | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/36] | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006045016 (ENERDEL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]DE102013220610 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,12* paragraphs [0006] , [0 26] - [0028] - [0 49] - [0054] *; | [Y]DE102016219452 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-5,12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0055] *; | [YA]DE102016222320 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-5,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0049] * [A] 6-11; | [Y]DE102017201241 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-5,12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0043] * | by applicant | DE112014000836T | DE102014226190 | DE102016222320 |