EP3866356 - METHOD OF MEASURING A TOTAL RADIATED POWER OF A DEVICE UNDER TEST AS WELL AS TEST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abadie, Vincent c/o Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 Munich / DE | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 20157712.9 | 17.02.2020 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866356 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3866356 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/10 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
H04B17/102 (EP,US);
H04B17/20 (CN);
H04M1/24 (CN);
H04W24/06 (US);
H04W88/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2022/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER TOTALEN STRAHLUNGSLEISTUNG EINES PRÜFLINGS SOWIE PRÜFSYSTEM | [2021/33] | English: | METHOD OF MEASURING A TOTAL RADIATED POWER OF A DEVICE UNDER TEST AS WELL AS TEST SYSTEM | [2021/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA PUISSANCE TOTALE RAYONNÉE D'UN DISPOSITIF SOUS TEST AINSI QU'UN SYSTÈME DE TEST | [2021/33] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 01.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015085087 (DB NETWORKS INC [US]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0244] *; | [XYI]WO2019096802 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,5-8,12,14 * figures 3b,4a * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 29 * * page 11, line 8 - line 13 * * page 8, line 28 - page 10, line 15 * * page 12, line 34 - page 15, line 30 * * page 18, line 33 - page 20, line 15 * * page 21, line 1 - page 22, line 2 * * page 25, line 5 - page 31, line 2 * * page 40, line 12 - page 41, line 24 * * page 45, line 4 - page 46, line 18 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 9-11,13; | [Y]US2019182855 (BABAEI ALIREZA [US], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0211] *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; User Equipment (UE) conformance specification; Radio transmission and reception; Part 2: Range 2 Standalone (Release 16)", vol. RAN WG5, no. V16.2.0, (20200114), pages 1 - 479, 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.521-2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/Specs/archive/38_series/38.521-2/38521-2-g20.zip 38521-2-g20.doc, (20200114), XP051860782 [A] 1-14 * page 431 - page 436 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; 5GS; User Equipment (UE) conformance specification; Part 1: Common test environment (Release 16)", vol. RAN WG5, no. V16.2.0, (20200114), pages 1 - 920, 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.508-1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/Specs/archive/38_series/38.508-1/38508-1-g20.zip 38508-1-g20.doc, (20200114), XP051860780 [A] 1-14 * page 889 * |