EP3868265 - COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BaByliss Faco sprl Avenue de l'Indépendance 25 4020 Wandre / BE | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JULEMONT, Pierre Voie des Boeufs 5 4630 SOUMAGNE / BE | 02 /
GOERING, Alain Boulevard Sainte-Beuve 12 4000 Liège / BE | 03 /
ERNOTTE, Aubry Rue Joseph Sonveau 2 4910 Theux / BE | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | AWA Benelux Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme - Bât. K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 20158211.1 | 19.02.2020 | [2021/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868265 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/06 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A47J37/0611 (EP,US);
A47J37/0635 (EP,US);
F24C7/067 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHVORRICHTUNG | [2021/34] | English: | COOKING DEVICE | [2021/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/32] | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3811375 (FRITZSCHE D) [Y] 1-4,6,8-10 * column 2, lines 11-36 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 19 * * figures 1, 4, 5; claim 6 *; | [YA]WO2014076511 (MAVRIDIS VASILEIOS [GR]) [Y] 1-4,6,8-10 * page 1, lines 5-22 * * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 18 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 7; | [Y]DE102014227046 (WMF CONSUMER ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6,8-10* paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1400194 | US2004217109 |