EP3708617 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF HYDROPHOBIC COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daware, Santosh Vasant Tata Consultancy Services Limited Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54-B 54-B, Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar 411013 Pune - Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
Rai, Beena Tata Consultancy Services Limited Tata Research Development & Design Centre, 54-B 54-B, Hadapsar Industrial Estate, Hadapsar 411013 Pune - Maharashtra / IN | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20159042.9 | 24.02.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | IN201921010010 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: IN201921010010 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708617 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C09D5/16, C09D7/62, C09D7/80 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
C09D7/62 (EP);
C09D183/06 (US);
C09D5/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/1681 (EP);
C09D7/61 (US);
C09D7/67 (US);
C09D7/80 (EP);
C08K2003/2227 (US);
C08K2201/005 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HYDROPHOBEN BESCHICHTUNG | [2020/38] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF HYDROPHOBIC COATING | [2020/38] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT HYDROPHOBE | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 16.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102009014164 (FOERDERUNG VON MEDIZIN BIO UND [DE], et al); | [A]KR20100127004 (SUKGYUNG A T CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN105602297 (UNIV TIANJIN TECHNOLOGY); | [A]CN107916069 (UNIV QINGHAI); | [A]CN108117276 (TIANJIN VOCATIONAL INST); | [A]CN108298558 (PETROCHINA CO LTD); | [X]CN108659581 (CHENGDU JINTIAN CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); |