EP3872835 - ROTATABLE X-RAY TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietz, Volker Brahmsstraße 4 91315 Höchstadt an der Aisch / DE | 02 /
Freudenberger, Jörg Am Mühlberg 6 90562 Kalchreuth / DE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20160060.8 | 28.02.2020 | [2021/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3872835 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/16 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
H01J35/16 (EP);
H01J2235/0236 (EP);
H01J2235/1073 (EP);
H01J2235/162 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTIERBARE RÖNTGENRÖHRE | [2021/35] | English: | ROTATABLE X-RAY TUBE | [2021/35] | French: | TUBE À RAYONS X ROTATIF | [2021/35] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 04.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE69618283T (VARIAN MED SYS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * siehe Abb. 1 und deren Beschreibung; * [A] 11-15 [I] 5,9,10; | [A]DE69221280T (PICKER INT INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0201406 | WO2010136325 | US6327340 | US6198803 | US2017148606 | DE3615148 | DE102017208680 | DE102008032995 | DE102010020151 |