EP3715796 - MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW MEASURING DEVICE WITH CONDUCTIVITY MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW MEASURING DEVICE WITH CONDUCTIVITY MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krohne Messtechnik GmbH Ludwig-Krohne-Strasse 5 47058 Duisburg / DE | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brockhaus, Helmut Revierstr. 6 46145 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Dabrowski, Markus Rotdornstraße 51 47269 Duisburg / DE | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/24] | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2020/40] | Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 20160341.2 | 02.03.2020 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | DE201910107904 | 27.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019107904 | [2020/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715796 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3715796 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/60, // G01N27/08 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP,CN,US);
G01F1/58 (CN);
G01F1/586 (US);
G01F1/584 (US);
G01F1/588 (US);
G01F1/64 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVES DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄT MIT LEITFÄHIGKEITSMESSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVEN DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄTES MIT LEITFÄHIGKEITSMESSEINRICHTUNG | [2020/40] | English: | MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW MEASURING DEVICE WITH CONDUCTIVITY MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW MEASURING DEVICE WITH CONDUCTIVITY MEASURING DEVICE | [2020/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE DÉBIT MAGNÉTIQUE-INDUCTEUR POURVU D'AGENCEMENT DE MESURE DE CONDUCTIVITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE DÉBIT MAGNÉTIQUE-INDUCTEUR POURVU D'AGENCEMENT DE MESURE DE CONDUCTIVITÉ | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 13.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2022 | CZ | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | ES | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | IT | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | PL | 15.06.2022 | RO | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SE | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | BG | 15.09.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | GR | 16.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | PT | 17.10.2022 | IE | 02.03.2023 | LU | 02.03.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 15.06.2022 | |
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | CZ | 15.06.2022 | |
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 15.06.2022 | |
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0336615 (AICHI TOKEI DENKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 14 * * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 25; figures 2, 7 *; | [A]EP0626567 (ULTRAKUST ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 39 ** column 4, line 11 - column 6, line 35; figure . *; | [A]DE10243748 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0 50] - [0052]; figures 1, 2, 3 *; | [A]DE102009002539 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0058]; figure 4 *; | [A]DE102014007426 (KROHNE MESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0 42] - [0046]; figures 1, 2, 3; claim 1 * |