EP3719291 - COMBUSTION CONTROL DEVICE FOR ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUEOKA, Masanari c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
TAGA, Junichi c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
OMORI, Hideki c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
MARUYAMA, Keiji c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
TOKUNAGA, Tatsuhiro c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 06 /
OHURA, Takuya c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 07 /
MIYAMOTO, Toru c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 08 /
NISHIDA, Tomohiro c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 09 /
TANIMURA, Kenji c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 10 /
TAKAYAMA, Shinji c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 11 /
KAWAI, Yusuke c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 12 /
INOUE, Atsushi c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 20160392.5 | 02.03.2020 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | JP20190072069 | 04.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019072069 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719291 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3719291 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/30, F02D41/40 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
F02D41/0062 (EP);
F02D13/0261 (US);
F02D41/0007 (US);
F02D41/006 (US);
F02D41/0085 (EP);
F02D41/3041 (EP);
F02D41/38 (US);
F02D41/40 (EP);
F02M26/01 (EP);
F02M35/112 (EP);
F02B11/00 (EP);
F02D2041/389 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MOTOR | [2020/41] | English: | COMBUSTION CONTROL DEVICE FOR ENGINE | [2020/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMBUSTION POUR MOTEUR | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 01.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007088487 (LAHTI JOHN L [US], et al); | [XYI]US2016377013 (YAMASHITA SHOHEI [JP], et al); | [A]US2018334998 (INOUE ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | by applicant | JPH08232729 | JP2019072069 |