EP3715275 - OPENING DEVICE FOR A PACKAGE AND METHOD FOR APPLYING AN OPENING DEVICE TO A PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORBARA, Angelo Via Volta, 7 42048 Rubiera / IT | 02 /
MARTINI, Pietro Strada Scola, 39 43122 Parma / IT | 03 /
DE PAOLA, Rocco Via Mar Ligure, 86 41122 Modena / IT | 04 /
RESCA CACCIARI, Sergio Via San Mamolo, 159 40136 Bologna / IT | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 20160700.9 | 03.03.2020 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | EP20190165237 | 26.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19165237 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715275 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74, B65D43/16, B65D47/14, B65D55/16 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
B65D5/746 (EP);
B65D51/222 (CN);
B65D43/169 (EP);
B65D47/142 (EP);
B65D55/0818 (CN);
B65D55/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖFFNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VERPACKUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN EINER ÖFFNUNGSVORRICHTUNG AN EINER VERPACKUNG | [2020/40] | English: | OPENING DEVICE FOR A PACKAGE AND METHOD FOR APPLYING AN OPENING DEVICE TO A PACKAGE | [2020/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE POUR UN EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE À UN EMBALLAGE | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5829672 (MOGARD JENS [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12,13 * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-9c; claims 1-17 * [I] 14-16; | [XI]DE202005005442U (KNOSALA KRZYSZTOF [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-12 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-4; claims 1-9 * [I] 13-16; | [XI]WO9701491 (CATTA 27 S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,12 * page 6, line 8 - page 9, line 18; figures 1-4; claims 1-11 * [I] 7,8,13-16; | [X]US4669641 (HOLMES WILLIAM A [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,12 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-3; claims 1-12 * |