EP3875992 - IMPROVING GPR SCANNING THROUGH THE USE OF EXTERNAL SCENE KNOWLEDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexagon Technology Center GmbH Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 201 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUNZ, Johannes Mühlenerstrasse 37d CH-9445 Rebstein / CH | 02 /
MENTL, Katrin Hintergasse 12 CH-9437 Marbach / CH | 03 /
GLÜCKERT, Jan Cramergasse 14 D-88131 Lindau / DE | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 20160875.9 | 04.03.2020 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875992 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/88, G01V3/12, G06N3/08, G06N5/047, G01V3/16 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
G01V3/12 (EP,CN);
G01S13/885 (EP,US);
G01S7/411 (US);
G01V3/16 (EP);
G06F18/24 (CN);
G06N5/025 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | G01V3/17, G06N3/08, G06N5/04, G01S13/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2021/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER GPR-ABTASTUNG DURCH VERWENDUNG EXTERNER SZENENKENNTNISSE | [2021/36] | English: | IMPROVING GPR SCANNING THROUGH THE USE OF EXTERNAL SCENE KNOWLEDGE | [2021/36] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DU BALAYAGE GPR PAR L'UTILISATION DES CONNAISSANCES DE LA SCÈNE EXTERNE | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 08.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2018042208 (XIHELM LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP3486674 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]); |