EP3706069 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, LEARNT MODEL MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIASA, Norihito c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | 01 /
HIASA, Norihito c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 20160938.5 | 04.03.2020 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | JP20190039089 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019039089 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3706069 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3706069 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
G06T5/70 (EP,CN,US);
G06F18/2148 (US);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06T5/60 (EP);
G06T2207/10004 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] |
Former [2020/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG GELERNTER MODELLE UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/37] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, LEARNT MODEL MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MODÈLE APPRIS ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 25.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2011123589 |