EP3875185 - SELECTIVE SUPERPARAMAGNETIC SINTERING AND CORRESPONDING INK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUNNICKE Odo Gartenbreie 65 48161 Munster / DE | 02 /
LEUCHS Susanne Recklinghausser Str.46A 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 03 /
HUPFELD Tim Mellinghofer Strasse 7 45143 Essen / DE | 04 /
HOLTHAUSEN Michael Koggestrasse 33A 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 05 /
PIERICK Vanessa Metterkampstrasse 9 45896 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 06 /
MISPELKAMP Dominik Goldregenstrasse 12 45770 Marl / DE | 07 /
CORNELIUS Maximilian Hofhausstrasse 7 60389 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 08 /
MACK Helmut Am Holzberg 6 83278 Traunstein / DE | 09 /
FRINGS Bodo Grauthoffweg 106b 33758 Schloss Holte Stukenbrock / DE | 10 /
GROSSE-PUPPENDAHL Thomas Flaesheimer Straat 345 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 11 /
MONSHEIMER Sylvia Tannenberger Weg 47 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 12 /
HEINDL Frank Wolfganstraat 14a 63517 Rodenbach / DE | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 20161171.2 | 05.03.2020 | [2021/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875185 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/10, B22F3/105, B29C64/165, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y70/10, C09D11/30, H01F1/44 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
B29C64/165 (EP);
C09D11/38 (EP,US);
B29C64/295 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y70/00 (EP);
B33Y70/10 (EP);
B41M5/0047 (US);
B41M5/38285 (US);
C09D11/322 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELECTIVE SUPERPARAMAGNETIC SINTERING UND EINE DAFÜR GEEIGNETE TINTE | [2021/36] | English: | SELECTIVE SUPERPARAMAGNETIC SINTERING AND CORRESPONDING INK | [2021/36] | French: | FRITTAGE SUPERPARAMAGNÉTIQUE SÉLECTIF ET ENCRE APPROPRIÉE ASSOCIÉE | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/33] | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4407338 (SILICA GEL GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, lines 11-54 * * column 6, lines 48-62 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X]US5928958 (PILGRIMM HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1-10 * example 1 * * claims 1,2,5 *; | [X]EP1308240 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] - [0027] - [0031] - [0056] - [0073] * * claims 1,2,4,5 *; | [X]WO2004034411 (FERROPHARM GMBH FORSCHUNGSLABO [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 11 * * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 21 * * claims 1,8 *; | [A]DE102005049718 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 12-15* claims 1,6-8,15-18 *; | [X]DE102005059751 (FERROPHARM GMBH FORSCHUNGSLABO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * examples 1,2 * * paragraph [0073] * * claims 1,7 * | by applicant | US2004137228 | US2007238056 | WO2012103974 | WO2014009107 |