EP3687020 - CHAIN OF POWER DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solaredge Technologies Ltd. 1 HaMada Street 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSCOVICH, Ilan c/o Solaredge Technologies Ltd. 1 HaMada Street 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | 02 /
GLOVINSKY, Tzachi c/o Solaredge Technologies Ltd. 1 HaMada Street 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | 03 /
BIEBER, Ofir c/o Solaredge Technologies Ltd. 1 HaMada Street 4673335 Herzeliya / IL | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 20161381.7 | 05.04.2017 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | US201662318303P | 05.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662318303 P | US201662341147P | 25.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662341147 P | US201662395461P | 16.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662395461 P | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687020 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/12, H02J3/38, H02S40/34, H01R4/00, H01R25/00, H02S40/36 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
H02J1/12 (EP,US);
H02S40/30 (CN);
H01R25/00 (US);
H01R4/00 (US);
H02J1/02 (US);
H02J1/10 (CN);
H02J3/38 (CN,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,CN,US);
H02J3/388 (US);
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
H02S40/32 (EP,US);
H02S40/34 (EP,US);
H02S40/36 (EP,US);
H02S50/00 (US);
H02S50/10 (EP,US);
H02J1/00 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,CN,US);
H02J2300/26 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | KETTE VON LEISTUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/31] | English: | CHAIN OF POWER DEVICES | [2020/31] | French: | CHAÎNE DE DISPOSITIFS DE PUISSANCE | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17165027.8 / EP3229332 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008283118 (ROTZOLL ROBERT R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-15 * [I] 3,6-9,12-14; | [XI]US2009296434 (DE ROOIJ MICHAEL ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-5 *[I] 7-11,13,14; | [XI]US2010131108 (MEYER DALLAS W [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0223]; figures 1-21 * [I] 3,7-9,12-14; | [XI]EP2355268 (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-5 * [I] 3,7-9,12-14; | [XI]DE102013106255 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,15 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-6 * [I] 3,6-9,12-14; | [XI]US8963378 (FORNAGE MARTIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-11,15 * column 2, line 40 - column 11, line 43; figures 1-15 * [I] 3,6,7,12-14 |