EP3690044 - CRISPR ENABLED MULTIPLEXED GENOME ENGINEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado, a body corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILL, Ryan, T. 2025 Ash Street Denver, CO 80227 / US | 02 /
GARST, Andrew 5505 Valmont Road 1 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 20161652.1 | 11.02.2015 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | US201461938608P | 11.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461938608 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3690044 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3690044 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12N15/11, C12N15/90, C40B40/08, C40B50/06, C12N9/22 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
C12N15/902 (EP,GB,IL,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/1024 (IL,US);
C12N15/1082 (IL,US);
C12N15/1093 (IL,US);
C12N15/11 (IL,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/113 (KR);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C12N9/22 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C40B40/08 (EP,GB,IL,US);
C40B50/06 (EP,GB);
C12N2310/10 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/531 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | C12N15/11, C12N15/00, C12N15/86, A01N63/00, C40B20/04, C40B30/04, C40B40/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CRISPR-AKTIVIERTES MULTIPLEXED-GENOM-ENGINEERING | [2020/32] | English: | CRISPR ENABLED MULTIPLEXED GENOME ENGINEERING | [2020/32] | French: | INGÉNIERIE GÉNOMIQUE MULTIPLEXE VALIDÉE AYANT RECOURS AU SYSTÈME CRISPR | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15749644.9 / EP3105328 | Divisional application(s) | EP21200160.6 / EP3985114 | EP22164530.2 / EP4063503 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013176772 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 26] *; | [XPI] - PINES GUR ET AL, Codon Compression Algorithms for Saturation Mutagenesis, ACS SYNTHETIC BIOLOGY, VOL. 4, NR. 5, PAGE(S) 604-614, (20141010), ISSN 2161-5063(print), XP002771109 [XP] 1,10,12,13 * page 608, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 609, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 5 * * page 613, column 1, line 3 - page 613, column 2, line 2 * [I] 2-9,11 | [A] - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", SCIENCE, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | [A] - WENYAN JIANG ET AL, "RNA-guided editing of bacterial genomes using CRISPR-Cas systems", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, us, (20130301), vol. 31, no. 3, doi:10.1038/nbt.2508, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 233 - 239, XP055545605 [A] 1-13 * page 233, column 2, paragraph 2 * * Online suppl. Figure 2; page 234, column 1, paragraphs 1-3; figures 1A,B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2508 | [A] - BIKARD DAVID ET AL, "CRISPR Interference Can Prevent Natural Transformation and Virulence Acquisition during In Vivo Bacterial Infection", vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CHOM.2012.06.003, ISSN 1931-3128, (20120816), pages 177 - 186, CELL HOST & MICROBE, ELSEVIER, NL, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S1931312812002296?via%3Dihub, (20120815), XP028934538 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chom.2012.06.003 | by applicant | - JINEK et al., Science, (20120000), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821 | - CONG et al., Science, (20130000), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 819 - 823 | - DICARLO et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20130000), vol. 41, pages 4336 - 4343 | - WAAIJERS et al., Genetics, (20130000), vol. 195, pages 1187 - 1191 | - WANG et al., Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, pages 273 - 297 | - BROUNS et al., Science, (20080000), vol. 321, pages 960 - 964 | - SEMENOVA et al., PNAS, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 10098 - 10103 | - DATTA et al., Gene, (20080000), vol. 379, pages 109 - 115 | - CONSTANTINO et al., PNAS, (20030000), vol. 100, pages 15748 - 15753 | - WANG et al., Nature, (20090000), vol. 460, pages 894 - 898 | - WANG et al., Nat. Methods, (20120000), vol. 9, pages 591 - 593 | - WARNER et al., Nat. Biotechnol, (20100000), vol. 28, pages 856 - 862 | - WANG et al., Nature, (20080000), vol. 460, pages 894 - 898 | - BHAYA et al., Ann. Rev. of Genetics, (20110000), vol. 45, pages 273 - 297 | - WITHERS et al., App. Environ. Microbiol, (20070000), vol. 73, pages 6277 - 6283 | - ZHENG et al., Biotechnol. for biofuels, (20130000), vol. 6, page 57 |