EP3734838 - SIGNAL DETECTION FOR GPON OPTICAL LINE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semtech Corporation 200 Flynn Road Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALENCIA, Miguel 3 Alma Vale Road Bristol, B28 2HL / GB | 02 /
BISSONAUTH, Nirmal 33 Perry Road Long Ashton Bristol, BS414FE / GB | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 20161737.0 | 09.03.2020 | [2020/45] | Priority number, date | US201916401107 | 01.05.2019 Original published format: US201916401107 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3734838 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3734838 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/24, // H04B10/69 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H03K5/2481 (EP);
H04Q11/0067 (CN,US);
H04B10/0775 (US);
H04B10/0777 (US);
H04Q11/0062 (CN);
H04B10/693 (EP);
H04Q2011/0083 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2020/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALDETEKTION FÜR GPON-OPTICAL-LINE-TERMINAL | [2020/45] | English: | SIGNAL DETECTION FOR GPON OPTICAL LINE TERMINAL | [2020/45] | French: | DÉTECTION DE SIGNAUX POUR TERMINAL DE LIGNE OPTIQUE GPON | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5528185 (LEWICKI LAURENCE D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 14; figure 2 * [I] 10; | [XI]US6826390 (TAMURA HIROTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 12, line 43 - column 13, line 14; figure 7 * [I] 10; | [XA]US2012212259 (RIVA ALBERTO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] - [0 51] , [0052]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0067]; figure 7 *[A] 5,9,10 | by applicant | US20240162718 |