EP3696223 - BINDERS AND MATERIALS MADE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Insulation GmbH Am Bahnhof 7 97346 Iphofen / DE | [2020/50] |
Former [2020/34] | For all designated states Knauf Insulation GmbH One Knauf Drive Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWIFT, Brian C/O ARC-IP rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | 02 /
XU, Ruijian C/O ARC-IP rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | 03 /
KISSELL, Ronald C/O ARC-IP rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 20161842.8 | 26.07.2006 | [2020/34] | Priority number, date | US200570245605P | 26.07.2005 Original published format: US 70245605 P | US200574307105P | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 74307105 P | [2020/34] | Previously filed application, date | EP20110171768 | 26.07.2006 | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3696223 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L5/00, C08L3/00, C03C25/32, C07H5/04, C08F251/02, C08L51/02, B29C70/68, C03C17/28, C09D105/00, C09D167/04, E04B1/78, E04B1/84, F16L59/02, F16L59/14 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
C03C25/321 (EP);
B29C70/68 (BR,US);
C09J105/00 (KR);
B32B17/04 (EA);
C09D167/04 (BR,US);
C03C17/28 (BR,US);
C03C25/14 (BR,US);
C07H5/04 (EP,BR,US);
C08B37/0009 (KR);
C08F251/02 (EP,BR,US);
C08L3/02 (EA);
C08L5/00 (KR);
C08L51/02 (EP,BR,US);
C08L79/02 (EA);
C09D105/00 (BR,US);
C09D5/08 (US);
E04B1/78 (BR,US);
E04B1/84 (US);
E04B1/88 (BR,US);
F16L59/026 (BR,US);
F16L59/14 (BR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/13] |
Former [2020/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | BA | 19.02.2021 | HR | 19.02.2021 | MK | 19.02.2021 | RS | 19.02.2021 | Title | German: | BINDEMITTEL UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE MATERIALIEN | [2020/34] | English: | BINDERS AND MATERIALS MADE THEREWITH | [2020/34] | French: | LIANTS ET SUBSTANCES CONÇUES AU MOYEN DE CEUX-CI | [2020/34] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 19.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06788492.4 / EP1919999 | EP11171768.2 / EP2433983 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4296173 (FAHEY DENNIS M); | [X]GB2078805 (TBA INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS LTD); | [X]EP0547819 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]); | [X]US5582682 (FERRETTI ARTHUR [US]); | [X]EP0911361 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]); | [X]EP1193288 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]); | [X]US6440204 (ROGOLS SAUL [US], et al); | [X]EP1486547 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) |