EP3702992 - VIRTUAL CURRENCY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states Nchain Holdings Limited 44 Church Street St. John's / AG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACGREGOR, Robert Scott 905 Beach Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6Z 1E1 / CA | 02 /
ONG, Milagrino Jose C. 31-2375 West Broadway Vancouver, British Columbia V6K 2E6 / CA | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Fraser, Karen Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House 17 Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 20161897.2 | 18.03.2015 | [2020/36] | Priority number, date | US201414218781 | 18.03.2014 Original published format: US201414218781 | US201414218776 | 18.03.2014 Original published format: US201414218776 | US201414218763 | 18.03.2014 Original published format: US201414218763 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702992 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/36, G07F17/32, G06Q20/06, H04L9/32, G06Q20/12 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
G06Q20/36 (EP);
G06Q20/0655 (EP);
G06Q20/0658 (EP);
G06Q20/12 (EP);
H04L9/0894 (EP);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VIRTUELLES WÄHRUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/36] | English: | VIRTUAL CURRENCY SYSTEM | [2020/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DEVISES VIRTUEL | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 24.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15764765.2 / EP3120309 | Divisional application(s) | EP24198242.0 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002161721 (YUAN XINHONG [US], et al); | [A]US2005165858 (TOM RICHARD W [US], et al); | [A]US2008313450 (ROSENBERG JONATHAN [US]); | [A]US2013054471 (SAMID GIDEON [US]); | [A]US2013346164 (RAMAMURTI RAJKUMAR [US]); |