EP3686742 - SELECTIVE DATA STORAGE IN LSB AND MSB PAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUBOWITZ, Amit 61 Yossef Street 71724 Modi'in / IL | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 20162061.4 | 14.05.2012 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | US201161486284P | 15.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161486284 P | US201213426799 | 22.03.2012 Original published format: US201213426799 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686742 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
G06F3/061 (EP);
G06F13/16 (KR);
G06F3/065 (US);
G06F12/0246 (EP,US);
G06F12/0253 (US);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/064 (EP);
G06F3/067 (US);
G06F3/0679 (EP);
G11C7/10 (KR);
G06F2212/1024 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE DATENSPEICHERUNG AUF LSB- UND MSB-SEITEN | [2020/31] | English: | SELECTIVE DATA STORAGE IN LSB AND MSB PAGES | [2020/31] | French: | STOCKAGE SÉLECTIF DE DONNÉES DANS DES PAGES LSB ET MSB | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 18.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12167837.9 / EP2525293 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008016308 (BARTLEY GERALD K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008291731 (EREZ ERAN [IL]) [Y] 7,8,10,15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] *; | [X]US2009216936 (CHU CHIEN-HUA [TW], et al) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [XY]US2010169602 (HULBERT JARED E [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9,12-14 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0041] * * tables 1,2 * [Y] 7,8,10,15 | by applicant | US2009049234 | US2011010489 |