EP3766333 - WRAPPING DEVICE, AGRICULTURAL BALING PRESS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE WRAPPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/03] | AGRICULTURAL BALING PRESS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | ||
[2021/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Usines CLAAS France S.A.S Route de Thionville 57140 St. Rémy / Woippy / FR | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rongvaux, Laurent 37, Grand Rue 54800 Tronville / FR | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 20162271.9 | 11.03.2020 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | DE201910119280 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019119280 | [2021/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3766333 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3766333 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/07 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A01F15/071 (EP);
A01F2015/076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WICKELEINRICHTUNG, LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE RUNDBALLENPRESSE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DER WICKELEINRICHTUNG | [2021/49] | English: | WRAPPING DEVICE, AGRICULTURAL BALING PRESS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE WRAPPING DEVICE | [2021/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT, PRESSE À BALLES RONDES AGRICOLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DU DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT | [2021/49] |
Former [2021/03] | LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE RUNDBALLENPRESSE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | ||
Former [2021/03] | AGRICULTURAL BALING PRESS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | ||
Former [2021/03] | PRESSE À BALLES RONDES AGRICOLES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | ES | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | IT | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | NL | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
MC | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | DK | 11.05.2022 | |
ES | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 11.05.2022 | |
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 11.05.2022 | |
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 11.05.2022 | |
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | FI | 11.05.2022 | |
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 11.05.2022 | |
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE102015112218 (CLAAS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [X] 1,2,6-11 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * [A] 4,5,13,14 [I] 3,12; | [A]US2017049058 (EUBANKS JASON C [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] *; | [A]EP3164000 (OY EL-HO AB [FI]) [A] 1,10* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * | by applicant | EP2033894 |