EP3718454 - A WASHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestel Beyaz Esya Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bolgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASIK, Rustem VESTEL BEYAZ ESYA SANAYI VE TICARET A.S. Organize Sanayi Bolgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Incorporated Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP Cankaya 06540 Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Cayli, Hülya Paragon Consultancy Incorporated Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP 06540 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 20162274.3 | 11.03.2020 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | TR20190004918 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: TR 201904918 | [2020/41] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718454 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, D06F35/00, // D06F39/00 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
A47L15/4238 (EP);
A47L15/4229 (EP);
D06F34/22 (EP);
D06F35/003 (EP);
D06F39/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHVORRICHTUNG | [2020/41] | English: | A WASHING DEVICE | [2020/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 31.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0083739 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]US6766812 (GADINI COSTANZO [IT]) [X] 1-5,7,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 6,8-13; | [AD]US2006266381 (DOHERTY JAMES E [US], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US2006266381 |