EP3713318 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF HANDLING DEVICE-TO-DEVICE FEEDBACK TRANSMISSION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASUSTek Computer Inc. No. 15, Lite Rd., Peitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | [2021/33] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states ASUSTek Computer Inc. No. 15, Lite Road Peitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Ming-Che c/o ASUSTek Computer Inc. No. 15, Lite Rd. Peitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | 02 /
HUANG, Chun-Wei c/o ASUSTek Computer Inc. No. 15, Lite Rd. Peitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | [2021/33] |
Former [2020/39] | 01 /
LI, Ming-Che c/o ASUSTek Computer Inc. No. 15, Lite Rd. Peitou District 112 Taipei City / TW | ||
02 /
HUANG, Chun-Wei c/o ASUSTek Computer Inc. No. 15, Lite Rd. Peitou District 112 Taipei City / TW | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 20162313.9 | 11.03.2020 | [2020/39] | Priority number, date | US201962821731P | 21.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962821731 P | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713318 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713318 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04L1/18, // H04W92/18, H04W76/14 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04L1/1861 (KR);
H04B7/0417 (CN);
H04L1/0027 (US);
H04L1/1614 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (KR);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0048 (CN);
H04L5/0053 (KR);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04L5/0057 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0082 (US);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (EP,KR);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP);
H04W76/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H04W72/02, H04W72/04, // H04W92/18, H04W76/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG-ZU-VORRICHTUNG-RÜCKKOPPLUNGSÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2020/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF HANDLING DEVICE-TO-DEVICE FEEDBACK TRANSMISSION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2020/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GESTION DE LA TRANSMISSION DE RÉTROACTION DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 01.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2020 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | TR | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | IE | 11.03.2022 | LU | 11.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.03.2020 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
TR | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 11.03.2020 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017295601 (KIM HAKSEONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2019029652 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002]-[0004], [0011]-[0014], [0020], [0022], [0035], [0069], [0070], [0093], [0094], [0097], [0106], [0107], [0113]-[0119], [0130], [0142], [0144], [0147], [0151], [0153], [0154], [0167], [0169], [0176]-[0178] * * figures 17a,17b * * claims 1-25 * [A] 1-11 [I] 13-15; | [A]EP3451563 (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Design and contents of PSCCH and PSFCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190215), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1903071, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96/Docs/R1%2D1903071%2Ezip, (20190215), XP051600767 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - "E-UTRA; Physical layer procedures (Release 15", TS 36.213 | - "E-UTRA; Physical layer; Multiplexing and channel coding (Release 15", TS 36.212 | - "E-UTRA; Physical layer; Physical channels and modulation (Release 15", TS 36.211 | - "E-UTRA); Physical layer; Measurements (Release 15", TS 36.214 | - LG ELECTRONICS, "Revised SID: Study on NR V2X", RP-182111 | - SAMSUNG, "Considerations on sidelink HARQ procedure", Rl-1901052 | - VIVO, "Physical layer procedure for NR sidelink", R1-1901683 | - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on physical layer procedure for NR V2X", Rl-1901931 | - CATT, "Discussion on physical layer procedures in NR V2X", Rl-1901993 | - LG ELECTRONICS, "Feature lead summary #3 for agenda item 7.2.4.1.1 Physical layer structure", Rl-1903769 | - LG ELECTRONICS, "Feature lead summary #2 for agenda item 7.2.4.1.2 Physical layer procedures", Rl-1903597 |