EP3708243 - FILTERING METHOD AND HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000006 / JP | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamoto, Kohei c/o Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0006 / JP | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20162606.6 | 12.03.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | JP20190045201 | 12.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019045201 | [2020/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708243 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708243 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/02, A23L2/74, C12H1/07, B01D61/20, B01D65/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
B01D63/021 (EP,US);
A23L2/74 (EP);
B01D61/20 (EP);
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B01D65/00 (EP);
C12H1/063 (EP);
B01D2313/2011 (EP);
B01D2313/205 (EP,US);
B01D2313/206 (EP);
B01D2313/2062 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | FILTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND HOHLFASERMEMBRANMODUL | [2020/38] | English: | FILTERING METHOD AND HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE MODULE | [2020/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FILTRAGE ET MODULE À MEMBRANE À FIBRES CREUSES | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2009160561 (SUMITOMO ELEC FINE POLYMER INC); | [A]EP2332638 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]); | [A]US2011192781 (STOLARIK DOUGLAS S [US], et al); | [X]US2014216258 (TAYLOR GARETH P [US], et al); | [A]EP2787254 (ARISAWA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]); | [X]WO2018092346 (ARISAWA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) | Examination | US2011036240 | by applicant | JP2009160561 | JP2013117250 |