EP3707999 - FENCE WITH FEEDING RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tubex Rue de la Gare 45300 Escrennes / FR | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOURDAIN, Dominique 20 rue Louis Boussenard 45300 Escrennes / FR | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 20162615.7 | 12.03.2020 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | FR20190002688 | 15.03.2019 Original published format: FR 1902688 | [2020/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3707999 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3707999 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/06 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
A01K1/0606 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHRANKE VOM TYP FRESSGITTER | [2020/38] | English: | FENCE WITH FEEDING RACK | [2020/38] | French: | BARRIERE DE TYPE CORNADIS | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 09.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3211064 (HOERMANN GEB SCHIMPFLE KRESZEN [DE]); | [A]FR2611429 (TAILLET JEAN PIERRE [FR]); | [A]DE20115338U (STALL PETER GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE202011005109U (STALL PETER GMBH [DE]); | [XAI]FR2979799 (COSNET [FR]) |