EP3718719 - PLATE PRODUCTION FACILITY WITH HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE DOSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/41] | PLATE PRODUCTION FACILITY WITH HEIGHT ADJUSTABLE DOSING DEVICE | ||
[2023/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SR-Schindler Maschinen - Anlagetechnik GmbH Hofer Strasse 24 93057 Regensburg Bayern / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robert, Stöcker Falkensteinstrasse 6 93197 Zeitlarn / DE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sattlerweg 20 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Firmungstraße 4-6 56068 Koblenz / DE | Application number, filing date | 20163064.7 | 13.03.2020 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | DE201910108333 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019108333 | [2020/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3718719 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3718719 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B28B5/08, B28B13/02, B28B17/00, B30B11/10, B30B15/30 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B28B5/08 (EP);
B28B13/0215 (EP);
B28B17/00 (EP);
B30B11/10 (EP);
B30B15/302 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | B28B5/08, B28B13/02, B28B17/00, B30B11/08, B30B15/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PLATTENPRODUKTIONSANLAGE MIT HÖHENVERSTELLBARER DOSATOREINRICHTUNG | [2020/41] | English: | PLATE PRODUCTION FACILITY WITH HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE DOSING DEVICE | [2023/01] | French: | INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION DE PLAQUES POURVUE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE RÉGLABLE EN HAUTEUR | [2023/01] |
Former [2020/41] | PLATE PRODUCTION FACILITY WITH HEIGHT ADJUSTABLE DOSING DEVICE | ||
Former [2020/41] | INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION DE PLAQUES POURVUE DE DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE RÉGLABLE EN HAUTEUR | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 15.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1285722 (DONAU WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH & [DE]) [A] 2,10,11* figures 1,2 *; | [XAI]DE102005013249 (GIANELLI UGO [IT]) [X] 1,5,8 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0024] , [0026] - [0028] * [A] 9,12 [I] 2-4,6,7,10,11,13,14 |