EP3738851 - DETECTION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DRIVING ONTO THE HARD SHOULDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartels, Arne Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Hasenwinkel 8 38448 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
Kolms, Thomas Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Ahornring 7 38553 Wasbüttel / DE | 03 /
Klingemann, Timo Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Immengarten 10 38524 Sassenburg / DE | 04 /
Krings, Robin FKA Forschungsgesellschaft Kraftfahrwesen mbH Aachen Matthiasstraße 13 50226 Frechen / DE | 05 /
Sakpal, Amogh FKA Forschungsgesellschaft Kraftfahrwesen mbH Aachen Alte Bonnstraße 223 50321 Brühl / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 20163324.5 | 16.03.2020 | [2020/47] | Priority number, date | DE201910206875 | 13.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019206875 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738851 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/12, B60W50/14, B60W40/06 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B60W50/14 (EP);
B60W40/02 (CN);
B60W30/12 (EP);
B60W40/06 (EP);
B60T2210/122 (EP);
B60T2210/32 (EP);
B60W2510/22 (EP);
B60W2510/227 (EP);
B60W2520/105 (EP);
B60W2520/125 (EP);
B60W2520/26 (EP);
B60W2520/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNEN EINER BANKETTFAHRT EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2020/47] | English: | DETECTION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DRIVING ONTO THE HARD SHOULDER | [2020/47] | French: | DÉTECTION D'UNE CONDUITE LE LONG DE L'ACCOTEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 18.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1538019 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [Y]DE102008058152 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [XY]DE102009000079 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2014032108 (ZENG SHUQING [US], et al); | [A]US2014249718 (LIU JIECHAO [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1538019 | US2015203109 |