EP3882810 - COMPUTER IMPLEMENTED METHODS AND DEVICES FOR DETERMINING DIMENSIONS AND DISTANCES OF HEAD FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Turnstrasse 27 73430 Aalen / DE | [2023/03] |
Former [2021/38] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss AG Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOYLE, Ben Soldauer Str. 5 81927 Munich / DE | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20163342.7 | 16.03.2020 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882810 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3882810 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/64, G06V40/16 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G06V20/64 (EP);
G06V40/171 (EP,KR);
G06T7/70 (US);
A61B3/11 (US);
A61B5/107 (US);
A61B5/1079 (US);
G06T7/50 (US);
G06T7/60 (US);
G06T7/62 (KR);
G06V10/84 (KR);
G06V40/165 (US);
G06V40/168 (US);
G06T2207/20076 (US);
G06T2207/30196 (US);
G06T2207/30201 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON ABMESSUNGEN UND ABSTÄNDEN VON KOPFMERKMALEN | [2021/38] | English: | COMPUTER IMPLEMENTED METHODS AND DEVICES FOR DETERMINING DIMENSIONS AND DISTANCES OF HEAD FEATURES | [2021/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉS MIS EN OEUVRE PAR ORDINATEUR ET DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER DES DIMENSIONS ET DES DISTANCES DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE TÊTE | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 22.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KUMAR M S SHASHI ET AL, "Face distance estimation from a monocular camera", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE, (20130915), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2013.6738729, pages 3532 - 3536, XP032966333 [A] 1-15 * sections 2 and 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2013.6738729 | [A] - SAI KRISHNA PATHI ET AL, "A Novel Method for Estimating Distances from a Robot to Humans Using Egocentric RGB Camera", SENSORS, (20190717), vol. 19, no. 14, doi:10.3390/s19143142, pages 1 - 13, XP055725398 [A] 1-15 * sections 3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s19143142 | [A] - BIANCO SIMONE ET AL, "A unifying representation for pixel-precise distance estimation", MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BOSTON, US, vol. 78, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S11042-018-6568-2, ISSN 1380-7501, (20180824), pages 13767 - 13786, (20180824), XP036807892 [A] 1-15 * sections 2-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11042-018-6568-2 | by applicant | US6262738 | US6535233 | US6995762 | US2010220285 | US9265414 | WO2018002332 | JP6392756B | - NA DODGSON, "Variation and extrema of human interpupillary distance", Stereoscopic Displays and Virtual Reality Systems XI, (20020000), vol. 5291, doi:10.1117/12.529999, pages 36 - 46, XP055454541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.529999 | - ADRIAN ROSEBROCKG. BRADSKI, "Facial Landmarks with Dlib, OpenCV and Python", The OpenCV Library'', Dr. Dobb's Journal of Software Tools, (20000000), URL: www.pyimageresearch.com | - D.E. KING, "Dlib-ml: A Machine Learning Toolkit", Journal of Machine Learning Research | - "Monte Carlo sampling methods using Markov chains and their applications", W. HASTINGS, Biometrika, vol. 57, pages 97 - 109 |